skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/06/2019 7:14:40 AM

Naganobu, Edward Roland

CPSO#: 23244

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: E.R. Naganobu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 21 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: 160 Dundurn Street South Hamilton, ON L8P 4K3
Date Received: 23 Apr 2014


Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Dr. P.C. Chu Dundurn Medical Group 160 Dundurn Street South Hamilton, Ontario L8P 4K3 Tel: (905) 528-5480 Fax: (905) 389-1104
Date Received: 04 Jun 2009

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1972 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014