skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 17/08/2019 10:51:33 PM

Monchesky, Theodore Carl

CPSO#: 23204

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Oct 1970
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 09 Jul 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone: (905) 721-4300 Ext. 5340
Fax: (905) 723-2541 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Monchesky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Monchesky ( CPSO# 23204 )

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9

Business Address:
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 723-8551

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1970
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 09 Jul 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 09 Jul 2019 Active
             As from July 9, 2019, the following is imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Theodore Carl
            Monchesky in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Monchesky
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. THEODORE CARL MONCHESKY
                                          ("Dr. Monchesky")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended;

                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                   "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Monchesky, certificate of registration number 23204, am a member
                  of the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Monchesky, acknowledge that following a public complaint, the
                  College conducted an investigation bearing File Number 1106477 (the
                  "Investigation") into my internal medicine practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Monchesky, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective immediately.

            (5)   Professional Education 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Monchesky, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "A", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   individualized instruction in professionalism and
                              communications satisfactory to the College, with an
                              instructor selected by the College.
                  
            (b)   I, Dr. Monchesky, undertake to complete this requirement by the first
                  possible opportunity.

            (c)   I, Dr. Monchesky, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to
                  the College regarding my progress and compliance with the Professional
                  Education.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (6)   I, Dr. Monchesky, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (7)   I, Dr. Monchesky, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (8)   I, Dr. Monchesky, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (9)   I, Dr. Monchesky, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs
                  of Staff").

            (10)  I, Dr. Monchesky, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of
                  this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (11)  I, Dr. Monchesky, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (12)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Monchesky, acknowledge that, during the time period that
                        this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be
                        posted on the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Monchesky, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (12)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Following a public complaint, a College investigation was
                              conducted into Dr. Monchesky's internal medicine practice. As
                              a result of the investigation:
                  
                                    Dr. Monchesky will engage in individualized instruction
                                    in professionalism and communications.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Monchesky, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in
                        effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
                  
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (13)  I, Dr. Monchesky, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  the following information to any person who requires this information for
                  the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (14)  I, Dr. Monchesky, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (15)  I, Dr. Monchesky, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who
                  facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, to disclose to
                  the College, and to one another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (c)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: July 9, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Theodore Carl Monchesky to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 9, 2019:

Following a public complaint, a College investigation was conducted into Dr. Monchesky’s internal medicine practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Monchesky will engage in individualized instruction in professionalism and communications.