skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/07/2019 1:41:48 PM

Ash, Judith Marilyn

CPSO#: 23137

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Sep 1970
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Sep 1970

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
405-1 Benvenuto Place
Toronto ON  M4V 2L1
Phone: 416 618 9224 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 04 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 23 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JUDITH MARILYN ASH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1970