skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 17/07/2019 4:33:13 AM

Todd, Thomas Richard James

CPSO#: 23100

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 07 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 28 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Sep 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018