skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/09/2019 9:25:17 PM

Chiu, Victor Wai-Lee

CPSO#: 23029

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 04 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Victor Chiu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 11 2013

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 2013