skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/07/2019 9:43:30 AM

Isaac, Errol Barrymore

CPSO#: 23021

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Jul 1970
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1970

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suites 2 and 3
760 Brant Street
Burlington ON  L7R 4B7
Phone: (905) 637-7606
Fax: (905) 637-2139 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

2200 Fairview ST
Burlington ON  L7R 4H9
Canada
Phone: 905-333-6700
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

1060 Speers Road. #111
Oakville ON  L6L 2X4
Canada
Phone: 905-844-0181
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

9 Renwood Place
9 Renwood Place
Waterdown ON  L8B 0G6
Canada
Phone: (905) 689-0473
Fax: (905) 689-5151
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Errol Isaac Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 24 2007

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 04 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ERROL BARRYMORE ISAAC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISAAC is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1970