skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/09/2019 10:36:51 PM

Alsarraf, Dhia Abdul Hussain

CPSO#: 23002

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 03 Feb 1983
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Feb 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Baghdad, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Specified Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1980
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Feb 1983