skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/08/2019 8:32:59 PM

Stephenson, Honorata Arayata

CPSO#: 22916

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Aug 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Aug 2007

Summary

Date of Death: 7-Apr-2008

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino, Tagalog, Visayan

Education:Far Eastern University, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Aug 2007