skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 17/08/2019 10:49:47 PM

Honein, Charles Frederick

CPSO#: 22825

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Aug 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Cairo, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking to access their medical files should contact: Tina Dimitrova Email: tina@recordsregistry.ca Phone: 1-800-773-0003 Phone: 416-841-2158 13 - 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 24 Jul 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 May 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Aug 2018