skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/08/2019 5:25:29 PM

Souter, Francis Carl Glenn

CPSO#: 22771

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Canadian Forces H Svcs GP HQ 1745 Alta Vista Drive Ottawa, ON K1A 0K6
Date Received: 17 Apr 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014