skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 22/09/2019 6:49:41 PM

Singh, Satbachan Harnam

CPSO#: 22605

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: National Records Management Beamsville, Ontario Tel: (905) 563-0847 Fax: (905) 563-7712 Email: [email protected] Website: www.nrmcanada.com
Date Received: 24 Jun 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013