skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/07/2019 6:12:50 PM

Spencer, John Alan

CPSO#: 22594

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Leeds, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Nelson Medicine Professional Corporation 301 Victoria Avenue Fort Frances, Ontario P9A 3N5
Date Received: 21 Jun 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 25 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Specified Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 1970
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1991
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013