skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/07/2019 7:02:42 PM

Grant, Paul Anthony

CPSO#: 22472

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 27 Oct 1994
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of West Indies, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 17 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1969
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 27 Oct 1994