skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/09/2019 9:26:08 PM

Chiu, Aiy-Wa

CPSO#: 22404

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jan 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 12 Jan 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:National Taiwan University, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may write to: 105 Page Avenue North York, ON M2K 2B8
Date Received: 20 Dec 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1966
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jan 2012