skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/08/2019 4:39:20 PM

Huband, Donald Murray

CPSO#: 22403

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Oct 1969
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Oct 1969

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone: 519-822-5350 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. D. M. Huband Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Huband ( CPSO# 22403 )

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5352

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 18 Mar 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DONALD MURRAY HUBAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUBAND is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 1969