skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 17/07/2019 4:35:48 AM

Yue, Kam-Yiu

CPSO#: 22389

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Oct 2002
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 04 Oct 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:National Defense Medical Center, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Oct 2002