skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/06/2019 9:33:21 AM

Taggart, David Alexander

CPSO#: 22341

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 2004
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2004