skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/06/2019 1:40:49 PM

Saleh, Wasfy Seleman

CPSO#: 22313

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 09 Aug 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Cairo, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1966 RCPSC Specialist
Urology Effective: 29 Mar 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1969
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2012