skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/08/2019 12:01:06 PM

Handscomb, Arthur Robert George

CPSO#: 22288

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2014
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1969
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Sep 2008
Summary:

 On September 8, 2008, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Handscomb to have committed acts of 
 professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession.  
 The Discipline Committee ordered the following: 

1) 	that Dr. Handscomb appear before the 
 Discipline Committee to be reprimanded, the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the 
 register.

2) 	That Dr. Handscombe pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650.00 by October 
 8, 2008.

3)  	 Directs the results of this proceeding to be included in the register.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Sep 08, 2008