skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/08/2019 4:40:31 PM

Sennik, Bhushan Kumar

CPSO#: 22255

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jul 1969
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 1969

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Swahili, Urdu

Education:Irish Conjoint Board, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1199 Lorne Park Road
Suite 9
Mississauga ON  L5H 3A7
Phone: (905) 278-9797 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

1199 Lorne Park Road
Suite 9
Mississauga ON  L5H 3A7
Canada
Phone: 905-278-9797
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Bhushan Sennik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Sennik ( CPSO# 22255 )

Business Address:
9 - 1199 Lorne Park Road
Mississauga ON  L5H 3A7
Phone Number: (905) 278-9797

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 16 Mar 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BHUSHAN KUMAR SENNIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SENNIK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1969