skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/06/2019 9:37:03 AM

Muhlstein, Tomislav Renatus

CPSO#: 22221

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 04 Oct 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 04 Oct 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Slovenian

Education:University of Belgrade, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Oct 2016