skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/06/2019 7:16:12 AM

Ballantyne, Alastair

CPSO#: 22202

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Date of Death: 31-May-2014

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011