skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/08/2019 4:13:13 PM

Lee-Sing, Richard Allan

CPSO#: 22107

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS Tel: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 17 Jan 2017

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Dec 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017