skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/08/2019 4:39:46 PM

Friedberg, Abraham Martin

CPSO#: 21978

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Emergency records retained by the following hospitals: Sunnybrook Health Sciences and North York General Hospital. Cardiac Rehabilitation records retained by Toronto Rehabilitation Institute.
Date Received: 07 Apr 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015