skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/07/2019 9:10:47 AM

Greenspan, Samuel Louis

CPSO#: 21948

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Jun 1969
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1969

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hawthorne Place
2045 Finch Avenue West
Toronto
Toronto ON  M3N 1H9
Phone: (416) 745-0811
Fax: (416) 745-0568 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Revera H & G Baker Centre
1 Northwestern Avenue
Toronto ON  M6M 2J7
Canada
Phone: (416) 654-2889
Fax: (416) 654-0217
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Siena Cheltenham Care Centre
5935 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M2R 1Y8
Canada
Phone: (416) 223-4050
Fax: (416) 223-4159
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Fudger House
439 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1K6
Canada
Phone: (416) 392-5271
Fax: (416) 392-4174
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Revera Westside
1145 Albion Road
Toronto ON  M9V 4J7
Canada
Phone: (416) 745-4800
Fax: (416) 745-0445
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Samuel Louis Greenspan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Greenspan ( CPSO# 21948 )

Business Address:
Hawthorne Place
2045 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 1M9
Phone Number: (416) 745-0811

Business Address:
Revera Westside
1145 Albion Road
Toronto ON  M9V 4J7
Phone Number: (416) 745-4800

Business Address:
Revera H & G Baker Centre
1 Northwestern Avenue
Toronto ON  M6M 2J7
Phone Number: (416) 654-2889

Business Address:
Fudger House
439 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1K6
Phone Number: (416) 392-5271

Business Address:
Leisure World
5935 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M2R 1Y8
Phone Number: (416) 232-4050

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SAMUEL LOUIS GREENSPAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREENSPAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1969