skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/08/2019 11:48:09 AM

Keon, Wilbert Joseph

CPSO#: 21795

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 23 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1966 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jun 2010