skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/08/2019 6:19:29 PM

Puplampu, Buenor Obahi David

CPSO#: 21727

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 04 Nov 1985
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Nov 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 1971
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Nov 1985