skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/08/2019 4:36:48 PM

Superville, Errol Kevence

CPSO#: 21668

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jan 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jan 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:National University of Ireland, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking for medical records should contact Docudavit at (416) 781-9083, ext 103 and ask for Stephen.
Date Received: 14 Sep 2010

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2008