skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/07/2019 12:32:20 AM

Samu, Peter Constantin

CPSO#: 21639

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Sep 1968
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Sep 1968

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rad-Logic, Inc.
1 Benvenuto Pl - 705
Toronto ON  M4V2L1
Phone: 416-417-2392 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Samu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 24 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jan 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PETER CONSTANTIN SAMU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1961
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 1968