skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/07/2019 11:45:09 PM

Dorman, Thomas Alfred

CPSO#: 21601

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Dec 1996
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 19 Dec 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Dec 1996