skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/07/2019 11:31:48 PM

Rosser, Walter Wylie

CPSO#: 21558

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Walter Rosser Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 19 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Famly Medicine Centre, Queen's University 220 Bagot Street, Kingston ON K7L 5E9, Tel: (613) 533-9303
Date Received: 30 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1970 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019