skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/06/2019 9:33:16 AM

Korn, David Ashley

CPSO#: 21483

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. David A. Korn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 24 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: 65 Mann Ave Toronto, ON M4S 2Y2
Date Received: 16 Apr 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018