skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/07/2019 1:58:45 PM

Richie, Steven Jerome

CPSO#: 21422

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Jun 1970
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1970

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
217 Terrace Hill St
Brantford ON  N3R 1G8
Phone: (519) 759-0911
Fax: (519) 759-2304 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Canada
Phone: (519) 752-7871 Ext. 2500
Fax: (519) 751-5856
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Steven J. Richie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Richie ( CPSO# 21422 )

Business Address:
217 Terrace Hill Street
Suite 200
Brantford ON  N3R 1G8
Phone Number: (519) 759-0911

Business Address:
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5544

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 07 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STEVEN JEROME RICHIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHIE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Feb 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1970