skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/06/2019 9:52:11 AM

Ah Now, Walter

CPSO#: 21299

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 May 1968
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 May 1968

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Walter Ah Now Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Ah Now ( CPSO# 21299 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1974 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WALTER AH NOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AH NOW is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1968