skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/07/2019 7:23:56 PM

Brazeau, Joseph Maurice

CPSO#: 21273

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2004
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Ottawa, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 1968
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 16 Mar 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004