skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/06/2019 4:54:32 PM

Carroll, Norris Cameron

CPSO#: 21204

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jun 1998
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 1998