skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/07/2019 7:50:52 AM

Seguin, Gerard Arthur

CPSO#: 21195

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 84 Trailview Drive Sudbury, ON P3E 6M2
Instructions: Please write to the above address
Date Received: 05 Dec 2013

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013