skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/06/2019 5:23:37 PM

Matzko, Alexander

CPSO#: 21182

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Jul 1997
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 Jul 1997

Summary

Date of Death: 20-Jan-2004

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:McGill University, 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 1961 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1956 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jul 1997