skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/06/2019 4:57:32 PM

Horwich, Jay Phillip

CPSO#: 21030

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Apr 2002
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 16 Apr 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 May 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Apr 2002