skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/07/2019 4:44:00 PM

Steinberg, Wilfred Marvin

CPSO#: 21015

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Aug 1967
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 1967

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 503
55 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 1R6
Phone: (416) 864-5738
Fax: (416) 864-5795 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 16 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WILFRED MARVIN STEINBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEINBERG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1967