skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/07/2019 7:25:36 PM

Forssberg, Johnita Beth

CPSO#: 20937

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Kansas, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1978
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2006