skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/07/2019 1:28:35 PM

McKinstry, Errol Ernest

CPSO#: 20933

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Nov 1983
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jan 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Nov 1983