skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/08/2019 6:48:02 PM

Kelly, Michael Anthony

CPSO#: 20869

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Glasgow, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012