skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/07/2019 11:33:43 PM

Woolford, Bernard John

CPSO#: 20859

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact Dr. Woolford by email at: bjwoolford@hotmail.com.
Date Received: 11 Oct 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jun 2016