skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/06/2019 4:53:27 PM

Jaggassar, Theo Anthony

CPSO#: 20840

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Storage & Retrieval Services 111 St. Regis Crescent Toronto ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: 416-398-0638
Date Received: 15 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1972 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015