skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/08/2019 11:59:27 AM

Brannan, Dennis Leslie

CPSO#: 20824

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record from Dr. Brannan should contact: Dr. Vayne Pegado Suite 205 3155 Harvester Road Burlington, ON L7N 3V2 Tel: (905) 632-1803 Fax: (905) 632-3149
Date Received: 20 Jun 2012

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012