skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/06/2019 9:47:20 AM

Omaboe, Narh

CPSO#: 20699

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Ga

Education:University of Geneva, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 03 Dec 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2006