skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/06/2019 6:45:09 AM

McConville, Brian John

CPSO#: 20612

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jun 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 16 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Otago, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 Nov 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 2008