skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/06/2019 11:11:07 PM

Shaw, Reginald Ernest

CPSO#: 20608

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 20 Nov 1991
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1943

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1967
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 20 Nov 1991