skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/06/2019 7:12:48 AM

Watt, Adrian Nevill Erpe

CPSO#: 20590

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Jun 1992
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Date of Death: 20-Apr-2004

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:English Conjoint Board, 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jun 1992